Wilmington Trust Company v. Crescendo at Silver Springs Homeowners Association
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company
Defendant: Crescendo at Silver Springs Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02173
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation withdrawing 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, No. 15-15233 (9th Cir. Aug. 12, 2016). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile within twenty-one days after the stay is lifted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, beginning on 10/24/17, the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every one-hundred and eighty days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Response to Complaint. Crescendo at Silver Springs Homeowners Association answer due 11/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust Company v. Crescendo at Silver Springs Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescendo at Silver Springs Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?