Clark et al v. Bank of America Corporation
Plaintiff: Sonya Alexander and Maureen Clark
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv02228
Filed: September 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unopposed Motion for Approval of FLSA Collective Settlement, Named Plaintiff Service Payments, and Attorneys' Fees and Costs, (ECF No. 115 ), is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, good cause appearing , the Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, (ECF No. 116 ), is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 115 video hearing currently set for October 14, 2020, at 12:00 P.M. is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 119 Stipulation to Continue Hearing. The Court hereby continues the hearing on Plaintiffs' 115 Unopposed Motion for Approval of FLSA Collective Settlement to October 14, 2020, at 12:00 p.m., via Zoom Videoconference. The parties shall have until October 7, 2020, to file their supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of FLSA Collective Settlement, Named Plaintiff Service Payments, and Attorneys' Fees and Costs, 115 , is DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court DE FERS its ruling as to the remainder of the Unopposed Motion, 115 .IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a Motion hearing via Zoom Videoconference on 9/30/2020, at 2:00 PM to explain to the Court why the settlement should be appr oved and the case dismissed.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have until 9/23/2020, to file supplemental briefing to aid in the Court's decision as to the issues identified herein. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting 113 Status Report. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that additional time is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Approval of Settlement must be filed on or before 4/15/20. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephonic status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 4/29/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting 110 Stipulation Regarding Settlement and Upcoming Status Hearing. The Status Hearing currently scheduled for 2/10/20 is vacated; and The parties shall file a Motion for Approval of Settlement in 45 days, or, if not possible by that time, file a joint status report regarding the anticipated date for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Re: 97 proposed Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. IT IS ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 1:00 PM, 2/10/20, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting 93 Stipulation to Extend Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 89 Joint Motion to Continue Discovery Hearing. The parties must submit a status report on or before 11/27/2019 indicating whether the case settled at the 11/20/2019 mediation. If the case does not settle the parties must file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order on or before 12/4/2019. The status hearing scheduled for 11/25/2019 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that a discovery hearing is scheduled for 11:00 a.m., 11/25/19, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation to Extend Time for Parties to Re-Submit Proposed Notice and Consent-To-Sue Forms. The Parties will have until 4/22/19 to resubmit the proposed notice and consent-to-sue forms. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 53 Motion to Certify Class and Denying 59 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Justin C. Jones terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation to Permit Defendant to File Sur-Reply re 59 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 40 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Defendant's Motion to Strike is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Defendant's Motion for a More Definite Statement is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 49 Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have fourteen (14) days from the filing date of this Order to file a second amended complaint with the revived state law claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jesse L. Young withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 29 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their second amended complaint fourteen days after the issuance of this Order. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that 19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Authorized Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs is DENIED as moot with leave to refile upon the filing of a second amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 31 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify a Question of Law to the Nevada Supreme Court is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Alexander
Represented By: Jason T. Brown
Represented By: Nicholas Conlon
Represented By: Justin C. Jones
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: Kevin J Stoops
Represented By: Jesse L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Clark
Represented By: Jason T. Brown
Represented By: Nicholas Conlon
Represented By: Justin C. Jones
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: Kevin J Stoops
Represented By: Jesse L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?