Connor et al v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Plaintiff: Patricia L Connor and Sue A. Ratliff
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv02255
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 27 Defendant's motion to calculate attorneys' fees is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to pay Defendant attorneys' fees in the amount of $944 within 30 days of the issuance of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. The Court SANCTIONS Plaintiff Patrick, pursuant to LR IA 11-8(d), in the amount of 1/8 of the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred by Defendant in preparing for and attending the ENE, and 1/2 of the reasonable attorneys fees and costs incurred in preparing 23 the response. Defendant shall submit documentation and authority for its reasonable attorneys' fees in accordance with this Order, no later than 4/5/17. Plaintiff Patrick shall respond to Defendant's filing no later than 4/10/17. Defendant may reply to Plaintiff's response no later than 4/12/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connor et al v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia L Connor
Represented By: Dan J. Lovell
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue A. Ratliff
Represented By: Dan J. Lovell
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?