Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Homeowner Association Services, Inc., SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and The Foothills at MacDonald Ranch Master Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02257
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Wells Fargo and SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified text on 4/13/2020 (JM).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 67 SFR's Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that 68 Wells Fargo's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 74 Transunion's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default is GRANTED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Stipulation; Discovery due by 5/22/2018. Motions due by 6/23/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Dismiss; denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing without prejudice 18 Claim for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Lifting Stay. 33 Motion Replies due by 6/8/2017., 37 Motion Responses due by 6/22/2017., Replies due 14 days thereafter. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/22/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 20 Motion to Certify; granting 23 Motion to Dismiss. The Foothills at MacDonald Ranch Master Association Terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/18/2017, Responses to 37 due by 5/25/2017., Replies to 38 Motion to Dismiss due by 5/11/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 39 Motion to Stay.; Status Report due by 5/4/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Strike 25 Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeowner Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Foothills at MacDonald Ranch Master Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?