Shane v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Michael Shane
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv02263
Filed: September 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 26 the Commissioner's cross-motion to affirm is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court must enter judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Notice of Voluntary Remand of the Case or Cross-Motion to Affirm. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation to Extend Time re 19 Motion to Remand. (Responses due by 8/20/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation re 19 MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration . (Responses due by 7/21/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motion for Remand and/or Reversal. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shane v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shane
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?