Le v. Bank of America, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Hiep D. Le
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association and Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02393
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation to Extend Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/9/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 30 Defendant's Motion to Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are directed to submit a Joint Pretrial Order by 4/9/18. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 41 Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Under Seal is Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 36 Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal is Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 27 Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Under Seal is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 25 Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation to Extend Time re 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Responses due by 9/28/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Ggranting 9 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Bank of America, National Association Only. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation for extension of time (Second Request) re 1 Complaint. The deadline for defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 1/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 4 Stipulation of Extension of Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC. answer due 12/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le v. Bank of America, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiep D. Le
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?