The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. v. Thunder Properties, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Defendant: Copper Ridge Homeowners' Association and Thunder Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02399
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss or a status report by 11/26/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 43 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/12/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 First Stipulation Re: 43 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/22/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that the Court issues this order to advise the parties that discovery motions filed in this case will not be briefed according to the default schedule outlined in Local Rule 7-2(b), but will instead be briefed on shortened deadlines absent leave from the Court, see Local Rule IA 1-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation re Disclaimer of Interest. Defendant Copper Ridge Homeowners Association is dismissed from this matter. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Partially Lift Stay to allow Plaintiff to amend its Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that Defendant Copper Ridge Homeowners' Association's 21 Motion to Withdraw is Granted and the 13 Motion to Lift Stay and 14 Motion to Dismiss are Withdrawn. The 20 Stipulation to Lift Stay is Denied. This case is administratively STAYED. Once the proceedings in the United States Supreme Court in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Saticoy Bay LLC Series 350 Durango 104 v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage have concluded, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 14 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Responses due by 3/20/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK). Regardless of this stay, the plaintiffs shall timely serve process upon the defendants and file proof of service. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. v. Thunder Properties, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Sylvia O Semper
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Ridge Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?