Marshall v. The CBE Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gretta Marshall
Defendant: The CBE Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02406
Filed: October 16, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 34 Motion to Seal is DENIED, and the Clerks Office is INSTRUCTED to unseal Docket No. 35 and the exhibits thereto. The motion to seal at Docket No. 46 was previously denied without prejudice, but the Clerk's Office is now fu rther INSTRUCTED to unseal Docket No. 46 and the exhibits thereto. The "Motion to Withdraw" the previous motions to seal at Docket No. 51 is DENIED as moot, in light of the rulings on the merits above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 6, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 32 Motion to Strike (First Request). Responses due by 9/8/2017. Replies due by 9/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 25, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 37 Unopposed Motion Leave to Refile Motion for Summary Judgment with Redacted Exhibits is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 31 Motion for Summary Judgment is STRICKEN. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have until August 31, 2017, to refile the Motion for Summary Judgment with the redacted exhibits. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 Joint Status Report. No later than May 29, 2017, the parties shall file either (1) a notice that they do not currently seek the setting of a settlement conference or (2) a stipulation seeking a settlement conference that provides five dates on which all participants are available. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 18, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 14 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 8, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 Proposed Discovery Plan. As the discovery plan was not jointly submitted, it is hereby DENIED without prejudice. See Local Rule 26-1(a). Counsel for both parties are ordered to conduct the required Rule 26(f) conference and to file, no later than February 15, 2017, a joint discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. The CBE Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretta Marshall
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The CBE Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?