Kennedy v. UMC
Plaintiff: Patricia Kennedy
Defendant: University Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2016cv02418
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 12 defendant University Medical Center's motion todismiss is GRANTED. Counts one and two of plaintiff Patricia Kennedy's complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. University Medical Center answer due 12/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. UMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Kennedy
Represented By: Scott Dorman
Represented By: Kristina Miletovic
Represented By: Arnold Weinstock
Represented By: Dan M. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?