Rodriguez v. Your First Choice, LLC.
Plaintiff: Irma Rodriguez
Defendant: Your First Choice, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02447
Filed: October 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER for Supplemental Briefs on Jury Instructions. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Rejecting 33 Proposed Pretrial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due within 21 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Amend Complaint. Within 10 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve the first amended complaint that is attached to her motion. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Strike 5 Answer to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Your First Choice, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Rodriguez
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Your First Choice, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?