Fernandez-Valdez v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonia Fernandez-Valdez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02464
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 46 Joint Status Report. Plaintiff is to file a voluntary dismissal no later than 9/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that the parties shall file by 9/1/2017 either dismissal papers or a joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying without prejudice 28 Motion to Compel; 39 Motion for Protective Order; and 42 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery. Dismissal papers shall be filed by 8/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Defendant's 22 Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Respond to Requests for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172 and the procedures outlined in this Order with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 6 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a new stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order that complies with the Local Rules, no later than 11/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez-Valdez v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Fernandez-Valdez
Represented By: Orlando De Castroverde
Represented By: Alex De Castroverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Law Office of Charles Abbott
Represented By: Harrison J. Reynolds
Represented By: Ronald H Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?