Bullocks Jr v. City of North Las Vegas
Plaintiff: Leon Bullocks Jr
Defendant: City of North Las Vegas
Case Number: 2:2016cv02478
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 9 the magistrate judge's report and recommendation is ADOPTED. This case is DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 5 Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint. Amended Complaint deadline is extended to 1/13/2017. The Court is not inclined to grant any further extensions. The Clerk is instructed to seal docket no. 5 as it contains some personal identifiers (See LR IC 6-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff will have until 12/15/16, to file an Amended Complaint, if he believes he can correct the noted deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either make the necessary arrangements to pay the filing fee, accompanied by a copy of this order, or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff a blank application form. Plaintiff must comply with this order no later than 11/10/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: P- copy of IFP - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullocks Jr v. City of North Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Bullocks Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?