Blue Pilot Energy LLC v. Lexon Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Blue Pilot Energy LLC
Defendant: Brown & Brown Insurance of Nevada, Inc. and Lexon Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv02524
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. All pending motions are Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation to Disburse Interplead Funds. The Clerk of the Court is authorized and directed to issue a check in the amount of $66,250.00 made payable to Blue Pilot Energy, LLC which may be released to Blue Pilot's counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - SLD)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that counsel for Defendant shall file and serve a signed statement no later than 1/12/2017 (see Order for details re required information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 12/22/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Pilot Energy LLC v. Lexon Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Pilot Energy LLC
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Brown Insurance of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Salvatore C. Gugino
Represented By: James R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Bragonje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?