Bank of America, N.A. v. Bacara Ridge Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Bacara Ridge Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02533
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 73 Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 75 Defendant SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as all of Pla intiff's claims are time-barred.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 76 Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED as all of Plaintiff's claims are time-barred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 3 , 23 the lis pendens filed in this case are expunged. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 19 the $500.00 deposit plus any accrued interest, be returned to the Legal Owner designated in the certificate. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Re: 71 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Remove Attorney Vatana Lay from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Re: 52 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation to Stay Litigation. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 37 the Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to extend time to serve Cross-Defendant Smith. The deadline to serve Cross-Defendant Smith ishereby EXTENDED to 5/19/17. The Court further GRANTS 36 Defendant's motion to serve Cross-Defendant Smith by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to 36 the Motion for Service by Publication as to Derek L. Smith and 37 Motion to Enlarge Time to Serve Summons and Cross-Claim must be filed on or before 3/30/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 22 Motion to Certify a Question of Law to Nevada's Supreme Court is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/05/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation for Security Costs. IT IS ORDERED that BANA shall post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 as to SFR and Bacara within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Bacara Ridge Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacara Ridge Association
Represented By: Ashlie L. Surur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?