Cellemme v. Lynch et al
Plaintiff: Dree Ann Cellemme
Defendant: Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Loretta E Lynch
Case Number: 2:2016cv02539
Filed: November 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 68 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time. Joint Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 First Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying Government's 48 Motion to Dismiss. This case is referred to the Pro Bono Program for appointment of counsel for the purposes identified in this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of this order to the Pro Bono Liaison. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Pro Bono liaison - SLD)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting Defendant's 57 Motion to Stay. Discovery in this matter is STAYED until the Court announces a decision on Defendant's 48 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's 39 Motion to Quash is DENIED without prejudice to its reassertion should further discovery in this matter be necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 39 Motion to Quash. Defendant may file a supplement to its 39 Motion to Quash by 9/25/2017. Plaintiff may file a Supplemental Response within 10 days of Defendant's supplement. The depositions of Michael Wheat and Tom Stahl are STAYED pending the Court's resolution of the 39 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss and ( 35 Motion to Strike 34 Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an Amended Complaint by 9/18/2017. If Plaintiff does not file a timely Amended Complaint this case will be closed. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion for Relief from Requirement that Person with Settlement Authority Attend Settlement Conference. The Court authorizes Assistant United States Attorney Holly A. Vance to participate in the settlement conference in person as the sole representative for the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply to 13 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendants' Replies due by 3/29/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Plaintiff must file a written certification that she has completed the CM/ECF tutorial by 11/30/2016.After timely filing the certification Plaintiff must contact the CM/ECF Help Desk at (702) 464-5555 to set up a CM/ECF account. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellemme v. Lynch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dree Ann Cellemme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau Of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta E Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?