Danjon Capital, Inc. v. Honey Bear Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danjon Capital, Inc.
Defendant: Honey Bear Enterprises, Inc. and Sean Mclean
Case Number: 2:2016cv02624
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Responses due by 7/3/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 26 Withdrawal of 22 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The hearing on the 22 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel scheduled for 1:30 PM on 6/9/2017 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that a hearing on the 22 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is set for 6/9/2017 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The managing partner or representative of Honey Bear Enterprises, Inc. and Sean McLean must attend the hearing but may appear telephonically. Ahaji Amos, Esq. is invited to attend the hearing and may attend telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Responses due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Granting 12 Motion for Service by Publication. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danjon Capital, Inc. v. Honey Bear Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danjon Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth E Hogan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Hulet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honey Bear Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Ahaji Amos
Represented By: Maile Lani Esteban-Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Mclean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?