Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC v. Corpolo Avenue Trust et al
Plaintiff: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Defendant: Faissal Ahmead, Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Corpolo Avenue Trust, Republic Silver State Disposal, Resources Group, LLC, Southern Highlands Community Association, Teal Petals Street Trust and Triana Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02653
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER for Substitution of Attorneys. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/9/2025. Attorney Diana S. Cline for Teal Petals Street Trust, Teal Petals Street Trust, Carpolo Avenue Trust, and Resources Group LLC added. Attorney Michael F. Bohn terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JG)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Granting 146 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 140 Motion to Amend/Correct. Responses due by 12/14/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Granting 144 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to 140 Motion to Amend/Correct. Responses due by 11/30/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Granting 142 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Hugo Hernandez-Diaz terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Directing Entry of Final Judgment. The clerk of court to enter final judgment consistent with my order at ECF No. 135 , and to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the defendants' 130 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's 129 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. I declare that the homeowners associati ons nonjudicial foreclosure sale conducted on June 27, 2012 did not extinguish the deed of trust, and the property located at 3762 Corpolo Avenue in Las Vegas, Nevada remains subject to the deed of trust. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by October 1 7, 2023, Ocwen must either move for default (and then default judgment) against defendant Faissal Ahmead or voluntarily dismiss its claim against him. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By October 7, 2022, plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The defendants and proposed intervenor may file a response by October 14, 2022. Ocwen may file a reply by October 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Re: 104 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/12/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 Stipulation Re: 92 Motion to Intervene. Responses due by 8/4/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Stipulation Re: 80 Counterclaim. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 8/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/11/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/10/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Default Judgment; ORDER granting 75 Motion for Default Judgment; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Denying 71 , 72 Motions for Default Judgment without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 67 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Motions for default judgment must be filed by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the stay in this case is lifted for all purposes. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re ECF No. 27 Motion for Service by Publication, granting the motion to serve by delivery to the Secretary of State, directing Plaintiff to deliver a copy of summons attached to a copy of complaint to the Secretary of State by 9/15/2017, and to file a copy of the process with the Court by 9/20/2017; denying the motion to serve by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that 20 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Remaining Defendants is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file proof of service no later than July 3, 2017. FURTHER ORDERED that 21 Motion for Service by Publication is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mark Hutchings terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, Case No. 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK). Regardless of this stay, the plaintiffs shall timely serve process upon the defendantsand file proof of service. See Order for further details and information. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC v. Corpolo Avenue Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faissal Ahmead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corpolo Avenue Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Silver State Disposal
Represented By: Drew J. Starbuck
Represented By: Donald H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resources Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Highlands Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teal Petals Street Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triana Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Mark Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?