Klein v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Karin H Klein
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02673
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations re 28 Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter a final judgment in favor of Plaintiff, and against Defendant. This matter is remanded to Defendant Nancy A . Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, for further administrative proceedings. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/11/2018.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 25 Plaintiff Karin H. Klein's motion to reopen case is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 the court's order granting the motion to remand is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 22 the clerk's ju dgment is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in light of 20 the Commissioner's notice of withdrawal of her cross-motion to affirm, 17 the court's report and recommendation is WITHDRAWN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 the Commis sioners motion to remand is REINSTATED. The Commissioner must reply to Plaintiffs opposition to 23 the motion to remand by 12/5/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Remand. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter a final judgment in favor of Plaintiff, and against Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that 11 Plaintiff's motion for reversal be denied. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that 12 the Commissioner's cross-motion to affirm be granted. Objections to R&R due by 11/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: April Angelina Alongi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin H Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?