Neeman v. The Bank of New York, et al.,
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Neeman
Defendant: Bank Of New York Mellon, GreenPoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Western Progressive Nevada, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02674
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying the parties' 40 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant GreenPoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 02/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 19 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendant Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.'s Replies due by 2/14/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) to Reply to 19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Defendant Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.'s Replies due by 1/31/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neeman v. The Bank of New York, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Lukasz Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreenPoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Lukasz Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Lukasz Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Neeman
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?