Jimenez v. Citifinancial Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marie E. Jimenez
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Citifinancial Servicing, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Verizon Wireless
Case Number: 2:2016cv02676
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 Status Report on Notice of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Verizon Wireless. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 02/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until March 28, 2017, to file a notice of voluntary dismissal, or a status report advising when the notice of voluntary dismissal will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until February 17, 2017, to file a notice of voluntary dismissal, or a status report advising when the notice of voluntary dismissal will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Citifinancial Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citifinancial Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Gary E. Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie E. Jimenez
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?