Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al v. Shadow Springs Community Association et al
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: 6364 Glenolden Street Trust, Red Rock Financial Services and Shadow Springs Community Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02677
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting in part 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining claims are DISMISSED, and the Shadow Springs Community Association's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF Nos. 48 , 70 ] are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court enter judgment accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/21/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. Errata or Supplement due 9/13/2019., Replies due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part 44 Motion to Lift Stay of Case; Any party that has been served with the amended complaint but has not yet answered it has until May 24, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond. The parties have until June 14, 2019, to meet and confer Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is STAYED. Once the United States Supreme Court proceedings in Bourne Valley and Saticoy Bay have concluded, any party may move to lift this stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending 30 Motion to Dismiss is Denied without prejudice to its refiling within 20 days of the order lifting the stay. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 02/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice.; granting 25 Stipulation.; Amended Complaint deadline: 2/16/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 7 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Responses due by 1/9/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al v. Shadow Springs Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6364 Glenolden Street Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Financial Services
Represented By: David R Koch
Represented By: Steven B Scow
Represented By: Brody R. Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadow Springs Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?