Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. SFR Investments Pool I, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Daybreak Gardens Property Owners Association and SFR Investments Pool I, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02735
Filed: November 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and against William B. Parker and Cynthia M. Parker. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting Cross-Claimant SFR Investments Pool's Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. 62 ). The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND DECLARED that William H. Parker and Cynthia M. Parker have no right, title, or interest in the property located at 1569 Applegrove Way, Las Vegas, Nevada 89110; Parcel No. 140-28-518-050.Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 35 Motion to Lift Stay of Case; ORDER denying 37 Motion to Stay Case; The moving party shall have 21 days from the date of the Nevada Supreme Court's decision on the certified question to file a modified Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation for Posting of Security Costs and 17 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. IT IS ORDERED that U.S. Bank will post a $500.00 security cost bond, pursuant to NRS 18.130(1) with the Clerk of this Court fifteen within (15) days after this Order is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. SFR Investments Pool I, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daybreak Gardens Property Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Natalie C. Lehman
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?