JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Diamond Creek Community Association, Mountains Edge Master Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02779
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to enter Judgment pursuant to the 65 Default Judgment and to close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that SFR shall, within seven (7) days of this order, file a motion for entry of default judgment or other appropriate motion. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice including the Complaint and Counterclaim between JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, and Diamond Creek Homeowners Association. The stay entered 3/22/2018 is lifted. This case shall remain open until such time as SFR resolves its pending cross-claim against the former unit owner. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that the parties shall submit a joint status report within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Stay (First Request) Entire Case Pending Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Second Request). Discovery due by 3/30/2018. Motions due by 4/26/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation to Extend Scheduling Order (First Request). Discovery due by 2/28/2018. Motions due by 3/27/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Mountain's Edge Master Association. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting Cross Claimant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 31 Motion for Service of Cross-Defendant Siu Ming Pang by Publication and 32 Motion to Enlarge Time to Serve Summons and Cross-Claim. The time for service is extended by an ad ditional 60 days from the date of this order is entered to allow SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC to effectuate service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Diamond Creek CA. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Defendant's 10 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Creek Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountains Edge Master Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Russell Jason Burke
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?