ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John & Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv02788
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of ME2 Productions, Inc. against Jasan Morris. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 53 plaintiff's motion for default judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall prepare and file an appropriate judgment for the court's signature within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 27 Magistrate Judge Koppe's report and recommendation be, and the same hereby is, ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all defendants except for Jasan Morris be, and the same he reby are, dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 46 plaintiff's motion for entry of clerk's default be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 41 plaintiff's motion for entry of clerk s default be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: the clerk is instructed to enter default against only defendant Jasan Morris, but not against any other defendant. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Kendra Williams. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation of Dismissal defendant Jorge L. Diaz. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kirk T Kennedy withdrawn from the case. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to update the docket to reflect that Mr. Diaz is now proceeding pro se and that his mailing address is the address identified at Docket No. 43 at 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that all Defendants except Defendant Angel Galliguez be SEVERED and DISMISSED without prejudice. To the extent any subpoenas remain outstanding in this case, they are hereby QUASHED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pr omptly serve a copy of this order on the recipients of any outstanding subpoenas, and shall file a proof of service of the same by June 20, 2017. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Order to Show Cause. To the extent any defendant wishes to do so, she may file a response to the order to show cause by 5/11/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that this case is transferred to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy Koppe for all further proceedings. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:16-cv-02788-JCM-NJK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file a copy of this order in any future case that it files in this district that is related to the Mechanic: Resurrection copyright. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?