Fisher v. Dicus et al
Plaintiff: |
Timothy Fisher |
Defendant: |
A. Dicus, James Dzurenda, High Desert State Prison, Nevada Dept of Corrections and Dwight Nevens |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv02816 |
Filed: |
December 5, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Cam Ferenbach |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 19, 2017 |
Filing
8
ORDER that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice based on Fisher's failure to file an updated address in compliance with this Court's November 6, 2017, order. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 6, 2017 |
Filing
6
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file his updated address with the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. If Plaintiff fails to timely update his address, the Court shall dismiss this case without prejudice.FURTHER ORDERED that 4 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and i nstructions for filing an in forma pauperis application.FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis for nonprisoners; or (2) pay the full filing fee of $400. If Plaintiff fails to timely file an application to proceed in forma pauperis for non-prisoners or pay the full filing fee of $400, the Court shall dismiss this case without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 8, 2016 |
Filing
3
ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new appilcation. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma paup eris by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. FURTHER ORDERED that within within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain the complaint (ECFNo. 1-1), but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?