Cabebe v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Sharon Barnum, Jerry P. Cabebe and Robert Sustrik
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02866
Filed: December 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 148 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 154 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and Denying 150 Motion to Certify Class. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and close this matter accordingly. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting 183 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule on Dispositive Motions and Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER re: 125 Motion to Seal. A hearing is set for August 22, 2018. The motion to seal is DENIED as moot with respect to Exhibit J and the motion to seal is GRANTED as to Exhibit I. The hearing will proceed as scheduled with respect to the remaining exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Bryan Zubay terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Granting 142 Stipulation to Continue Hearing Re: 125 Motion to Seal. Motion Hearing reset for 8/22/2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER that a Hearing re: 125 Motion to Seal is set for 8/9/2018 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Any party or non-party seeking sealing of any of the subject information shall appear for the hearing. Plain tiffs' counsel shall provide notice of this order to FIS Card as soon as practicable, and shall file a proof of service by July 20, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 135 Stipulation. Motions due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying 121 Motion to Compel and 122 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 117 Stipulation re Discovery Deadline. All other deadlines remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 115 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/22/2018. Motions due by 7/23/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 110 Stipulation re Filing of Fourth Amended Complaint. The Clerk shall file Exhibit 1, Proposed Amended Complaint which will serve as the operative Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re 96 Joint Statement. Plaintiffs' motion to compel is DENIED, Defendant's motion for protective order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and the motion for a special master is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Setting a hearing re 96 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Defendant's Counter-Motion for Protective Order (filed a a joint statement) on 3/9/2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 102 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/22/2018. Motions due by 7/23/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 FIRST AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 94 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 92 Stipulation for Extension of Time re: 91 Order. Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 90 Motion to Extend Time re 82 Order on Motion to Compel (First Request). See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER that the sealed materials at Docket No. 77 are STRICKEN from the record. The Motion to Seal 78 is DENIED as moot.Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this order on Fidelity National Card Services, and shall file a proof of service by December 22, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that the parties shall meet-and-confer on the underlying dispute in relation to the changed landscape by December 22, 2017. To the extent a dispute remains, the parties shall file, by December 29, 2017, a joint statement regarding each disco very request for which a dispute exists. ORDER that 42 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice and 69 Motion to Supplement is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER approving ECF No. 72 Stipulation re ECF No. 69 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority re ECF No. 42 Motion to Compel: Reply due by 11/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 68 Stipulation to Continue Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 2/8/2018. Responses due by 3/12/2018. Replies due by 3/26/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that 57 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Deadlines are SET as follows: Discovery due by 1/8/2018. Motions due by 2/7/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Denying 55 Stipulation to Extend Time re 42 MOTION to Compel (Oral Argument Requested), as the parties fail to explain how issues related to sealing impacted Equifax's ability to file a timely response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on correct disposition 10/13/2017 (ADR).
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 49 Minute Order. The order to show cause is Discharged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 44 Motion to Seal. The Court ORDERS as follows:The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to maintain Exhibit A-9 under seal for the time being at both Docket Nos. 43 and 46 ;Plaintiffs' counsel shall file, by October 11, 2017, a declaration as to why he filed on the public docket at Docket No. 43 what he identifies as a sealed version of the exhibit;Plaintiffs' counsel shall file, by October 11, 2017, a declaration as to why he did not comply with the Court' s mandate regarding the applicable procedures for filing under seal documents designated as confidential by another party;Plaintiffs shall file, by October 11, 2017, a supplemental brief in support of their position that the "compelling reaso ns" standard applies; andDefendant shall file, by October 11, 2017, either (1) a notice that Exhibit A-9 may be unsealed or (2) a brief supported by declaration indicating the standard applicable to the pending motion to seal and evidentiary support as to why that standard is met. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabebe v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Barnum
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry P. Cabebe
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sustrik
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?