Al Falahi v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Mohammad Al Falahi
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2016cv02921
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Based on the parties' 54 stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 49 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Holly Welborn for Mohammad Al Falahi substituted for Attorney Lauren Kaufman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. IT IS ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending the hearing de novo under 8 U.S.C. § 1421(c) to determine petitioner's eligibility to naturalize, and the Clerk of Court is instructed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/7/2019.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation to Withdraw Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Motion to Extend Time Re: 33 Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 25 26 Motions for Summary Judgment; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/31/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that 13 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that a hearing on the Motion for Protective Order (ECF No. 13 ) is scheduled for 10:00 AM, November 30, 2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that dispositive motions must be filed by 1/31/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on to correct due date 10/13/2017 (ADR).
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 5 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Falahi v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Al Falahi
Represented By: Alexandra C. Chrysanthis
Represented By: Amy M. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joseph Francis Carilli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?