Ditech Financial LLC et al v. Park Avenue Homeowners' Association et al
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Park Avenue Homeowners' Association and Red Rock Financial Services, LLC
Cross Claimant: Park Avenue Homeowners' Association
Cross Defendant: Red Rock Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv03021
Filed: December 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. The 38 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot. ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation re Discovery Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation Re: 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED as follows, the deadline for the Association to file its Reponse to Ditech and FNMA's Motion is hereby extended up to and including 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. The Court ORDERS that, absent leave for an extension being granted, the response to a discovery motion shall be filed within 4 days of the service of that motion and any reply shall be filed within 2 days of the service of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/28/2019. Any party that has been served with any response-requiring pleading and has not yet answered it has until May 24, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to that pleading. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Ryan D Hastings and Sean L. Anderson are substituted in place and stead of Elizabeth B Lowell and James W Pengilly for Park Avenue Homeowners' Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying the Parties' 10 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditech Financial LLC et al v. Park Avenue Homeowners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Thera A Cooper
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Thera A Cooper
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Park Avenue Homeowners' Association
Represented By: Elizabeth B Lowell
Represented By: James W Pengilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Avenue Homeowners' Association
Represented By: Avece M. Higbee
Represented By: Elizabeth B Lowell
Represented By: James W Pengilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Red Rock Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?