McLellan v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Curt McLellan
Respondent: Renee Baker and Adam Paul Laxalt
Case Number: 2:2016cv03038
Filed: December 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 18 petitioner's motion to reopen habeas corpus proceedings is DENIED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that 19 petitioner's motion for stay and abeyance is DENIED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that a certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for petitioner's failure to exhaust his available state-court remedies. The clerk of the court shall enter judgment accordingly and close this action. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that a certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 7 respondents' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part. Ground E is unexhausted. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to file a motion for dismissal without prejudice of the entire petition, for partial dismissal of ground E, or for other appropriate relief. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that 10 Motion to Extend Time to GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Replies due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 4 respondents' motion for enlargement of time (first request) is GRANTED. Respondents will have through 9/8/17, to file and serve a response to the petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall add Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General for the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall electronically serve upon respondents a copy o f the petition and this order. In addition, the clerk shall return to petitioner a copy of the petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have forty-five (45) days from the date on which the petition was served to answer or otherwise respond to the petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLellan v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Adam Paul Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curt McLellan
Represented By: Anthony P Sgro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?