Falls et al v. Desert Palace, Inc
Plaintiff: William J. Berry, Jr., Cynthia Falls and Shane Kaufmann
Defendant: Desert Palace, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00019
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER: Plaintiffs have until 2/12/2021 to revise their current proposed order and send it to the defendant's counsel. The parties shall then confer to finalize the proposed order and file it in court by 3/5/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting 174 Stipulation to Extend deadline to file Proposed Joint Pretrial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 168 Stipulation to Extend Pretrial Order deadline. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying 150 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Withdraw Attorney - Sandra Ketner withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 155 Stipulation; Re: 150 Motion for Reconsideration. Replies due by 1/7/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 151 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 150 Motion for Reconsideration. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Granting 148 First Stipulation to Extend Joint Pretrial Order Deadline (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Granting 143 Stipulation to File a Replacement Brief in Support of 136 Response to 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Granting 132 First Stipulation to File Supplemental Briefing Re: 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. Supplemental Briefing due within 16 calendar days of the date the district court enters this Stipulation as an Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting 121 First Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Submit Redacted Exhibits. Deadline: 7/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' 105 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Appendix 3 of Exhibits. If Plaintiffs renew their motion it must be filed by 6/21/2019 or Plaintiffs' exhibits will be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting 100 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/14/2019. Replies due by 3/14/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 87 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER granting 95 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 88 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting 90 First Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. Deadline: until either two (2) weeks from the date of the Courts order denying Plaintiffs' 87 Motion for Reconsideration, or until such other time following the close of discovery that the Court so orders should the Court grant any part of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 81 Third Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 10/21/2018. Motions due by 11/30/2018. Joint Pretrial Order: date is unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Second Stipulation to Stay Litigation and Extend Discovery Deadlines by 30 Days. Discovery due by 8/24/2018. Motions due by 9/24/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 59 Stipulation re Amended Answer. Desert Palace, Inc.'s Amended Answer due within seven (7) days of the Court's entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 29 Motion to Sever. Replies due by 1/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation to Stay Litigation Pending Outcome of Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 29 MOTION to Sever. Plaintiffs' Responses due by 10/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re 29 MOTION to Sever. Plaintiffs' Responses due by 10/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation re Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falls et al v. Desert Palace, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Berry, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen J England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Falls
Represented By: Kathleen J England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Kaufmann
Represented By: Kathleen J England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Palace, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?