Federal National Mortgage Association v. Springpointe Condominiums Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: ATC Assessment Collection Group, LLC, Brandon Stavros, Glen Larson and Springpointe Condominiums Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00025
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation for Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file, no later than 3/23/2017, either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time for Federal National Mortgage Association to file its response re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Springpointe Condominiums Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC Assessment Collection Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Stavros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springpointe Condominiums Homeowners Association
Represented By: Eric Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Brett M Coombs
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?