Bank of New York Mellon v. 4655 Gracemont Avenue Trust et al
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: 4655 Gracemont Avenue Trust and Blue Diamond Ranch Landscape Maintenance Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00063
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 69 , 71 the Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and for Reconsideration Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 and 60 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 59 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 48 and 52 Motions for Summary Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/18/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 53 the prior stipulation extending the deadline to 1/4/19 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 44 the motion to lift stay is GRANTED. Motions due by 11/30/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that THIS CASE IS STAYED for all purposes. Once the Nevada Supreme Court has answered the certified question in Bank of New York Mellon v. Star Hill Homeowners Association, 2:16-cv-2561-RFB-PAL/Nev. S. Ct. Case No. 72 931, any party may move to lift this stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ALL PENDING MOTIONS 35 , 38 , 39 are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling once the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Shadd A. Wade terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 stipulation to set aside default and extend time to respond to complaint. Clerk's entry of default as to Blue Diamond Ranch Landscape Maintenance Association is set aside and the defendant has 10 days to answer the complaint. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Stephen G. Clough terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. 4655 Gracemont Avenue Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4655 Gracemont Avenue Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Diamond Ranch Landscape Maintenance Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Shadd A. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?