Bank Of New York Mellon v. Blackrose Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Blackrose Investments, LLC, Deviation Investments LLC, Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC, Dorothy Harber and Pacific Harbors-Stonegate Property Owners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00065
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon and against Blackrose Investments, LLC as follows: It is hereby declared that any interest Blackrose Investments, LLC acquired in the property located at 2691 Juniper Hills #101 in Las Vegas, Nevada at the HOA foreclosure sale conducted on 9/9/2014 was subject to the deed of trust. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 36 defendant Pacific Harbors-Stonegate Property Owners Association's motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon may file an amended complaint on or before 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 36 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 3/22/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying without prejudice 18 Motion to Dismiss.; denying without prejudice 20 Motion to Dismiss.; Case stayed. Once the proceedings in the U.S. Supreme Court have concluded, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank Of New York Mellon v. Blackrose Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackrose Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deviation Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Harber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Harbors-Stonegate Property Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?