Jeffrey Morse v. Ten X Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Morse
Defendant: Richard Beston, John Branch, Brian Pebley and Ten X Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00073
Filed: January 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 7 , 17 Beston and Ten X's motions to transfer venue are GRANTED and 6 , 18 these defendants' motions to dismiss are DENIED without prejudice to the ability to raise any arguments still relevant af ter transfer before the transferee court. Branch's motion to dismiss or alternatively to transfer venue 19 is GRANTED in part as to the request to transfer venue and DENIED without prejudice to the ability to raise any arguments still relevan t after transfer before the transferee court. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 38 Plaintiff Jeffrey Morse's Renewed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Effectuate Service of Brian Pebley is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to serve Defendant Brian Pebley is 8/17/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Defendant Brian Pebley by Publication is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 34 stipulation to extend time to file reply brief. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/18/2017. Nunc pro tunc 3/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 14 Plaintiff Jeffrey Morse's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Effectuate Service of Brian Pebley and for Service by Publication is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 16 Plaintiff Jeffrey Morse's Motion to Serve Defendant Brian Pebley by Publication is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 27 the parties' stipulation to stay discovery is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the defendants' motions to dismiss or to transfer are denied, the parties must meet and confer and file a stipulated discov ery plan within 21 days of the order denying those motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Defendant Richard Beston's motion to stay discovery is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey Morse v. Ten X Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Beston
Represented By: Robert W. Hernquist
Represented By: Jay Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Pebley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten X Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Morse
Represented By: Terry A. Coffing
Represented By: Jonathan B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?