U.S. Bank National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Trail Ridge Community Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00079
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting 67 Motion for Default Judgment against Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. and Daniel Palacios. It is hereby declared that MERS and Palacios, any successors and assigns, have no right, title or interest in the P roperty and that SFR is the rightful title owner. This Judgement does not adjudicate SFR's claim against or the defenses of, any other party to this case. As this order resolves all remaining claims, the Clerk is directed to Close the case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 MOTION to remove attorney Dana Jonathon Nitz, Esq. from the Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Stipulation of Dismissal; All claims by and between US Bank and SFR are DISMISSED with prejudice. SFR has until 6/12/2020 to dismiss any remaining claim or file necessary motions to bring those claims to conclusion. If SFR fails to take such action by this deadline, the court may deem any remaining claims as abandoned and dismiss them sua sponte. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Trail Ridge Community Association; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation to Stay Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Shadd A. Wade terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that 8 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is stayed under NRS 18.130(1) until the $500 is deposited. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trail Ridge Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Shadd A. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?