Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. v. LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 5112
Plaintiff: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 5112
Counter Claimant: LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 5112
Counter Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00084
Filed: January 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Closing Case - Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.'s 56 Second Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. Pueblo at Santa Fe Condominium Association, Inc.'s 37 Motion to Dismiss is Denied. Pueblo at Santa Fe Condominium Association, Inc.&# 039;s 38 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied. Pueblo at Santa Fe Condominium Association, Inc.'s 57 Second Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied. Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.'s 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied as moot. Plaintiff shall prepare a proposed judgment and submit it to the court within 30 days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 67 Joint Status Report. The court will lift the stay and adopt the proposed briefing schedule of the parties. Supplemental Briefs in support of respective Motions for Summary Judgment are due 21 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that the parties shall file a joint status report within 30 days of the date of this order indicating the status of the current action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Second Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Settlement Negotiations. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying 60 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. The parties shall have 21 days to respond to the outstanding motions for summary judgment. If any party responds, the moving party will have an additional 14 days to file a reply in support of its motion. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's 44 Motion to Amend 11 Answer to 10 Counterclaim. Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.'s Amended Answer due 10/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying the parties' 16 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties are to submit no later than 4/26/2017 a proposed joint discovery plan that either (1) is based on the presumptively reasonable 180-day period outlined in Local Rule 26-1 or (2) provides an adequate explanation why a longer period should be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the parties are to file no later than 4/24/2017 a joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order that complies in full with the Court's Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying the parties' 13 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a proposed discovery plan that complies with the Local Rules no later than 4/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the parties are to file no later than 4/7/2017 either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. v. LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 5112
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 5112
Represented By: Stephen G. Clough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 5112
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Represented By: Stephen G. Clough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Dolembo
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Dolembo
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?