Ishikawa v. USAA Federal Savings Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Suzanne D. Ishikawa
Defendant: Experian Informations Solutions, Inc and USAA Federal Savings Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00094
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 19 Notice of Settlement. Plaintiff shall have until 12/11/2017 to either file a notice of voluntary dismissal against USAA Federal Savings Bank, National Association or to file a status report advising when the notice of voluntary dismissal will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 12 Amended Stipulated Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/21/2017. Motions due by 9/19/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ishikawa v. USAA Federal Savings Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Informations Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne D. Ishikawa
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?