Universal North America Insurance Company v. Colosi et al
Plaintiff: Universal North America Insurance Company
Defendant: Nicholas Colosi, Victor Colosi, Wendy Colosi and Marilyn Kennedy
Case Number: 2:2017cv00113
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation Dismissing All Claims. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. All pending motions [ECF Nos. 69 , 70 ] are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AMENDED ORDER Granting Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 30 Universal's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, and 39 the Colosis' motion for partial summary judgment, or in the alternative, to stay proceedings is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [40 ] the Colosis' motion to strike/objection to reference to juvenile-court proceedings is GRANTED. The court did not consider any information related to juvenile-court proceedings in deciding these motions. The Clerk of Court is directed to E NTER JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendants on all claims. That judgment must include the declaration that IT IS HEREBY DECLARED that Universal has no duty under policy number NVVH0000022865-0 to defend or indemnify Wendy, Vi ctor, or Nicholas Colosi from or for the claims in Kennedy v. Collins et. al, Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-16-740381-C. The Clerk of Court is directed to then CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation to Extend Time re 40 MOTION to Strike. ( Replies due by 10/24/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1018/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulation to Extend Time re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 40 MOTION to Strike. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation to Extend Time re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . ( Replies due by 9/26/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation to Extend Time re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . ( Responses due by 9/15/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than 4/28/17 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation Extending the Time for Defendants Wendy Colosi, Victor Colosi and Nicholas Colosi. Answer due 3/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal North America Insurance Company v. Colosi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Colosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Colosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Colosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal North America Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Priscilla Louise O'Briant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?