ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2017cv00121
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of ME2 Productions, Inc. against Mamadou Viady in the amount of $1,500.00 and Attorney Fees in the amount of $6,480.00. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that 49 Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall prepare and file an appropriate judgment for the court's signature consistent with the foregoing within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that 27 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that all defendants except for Mamadou Viady be, and the same hereby are, dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 43 Motion for Default Judgment is DNIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 19 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Dismiss the Case is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that all Defendants except Defendant Mamadou Viadybe SEVERED and DISMISSED without prejudice. To the extent any subpoenas remain outstanding in this case, they are hereby QUASHED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to prompt ly serve a copy of this order on the recipients of any outstanding subpoenas, and shall file a proof of service of the same by June 20, 2017. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 11 Order to Show Cause. The Court hereby ORDERS the recipients of the subpoenas not to provide the subpoenaed information pending resolution of the order to show cause.Plaintiff is further ORDERED to immediately serve a copy of this order on the recipients of the subpoenas, and to file a proof of service so indicating by noon on May 12, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that 13 Motion to Quash Subpoena is DENIED without prejudice. Interested Party ID No. 6 is instructed that he or she is free to file a new motion to quash the subpoena, but any such motion must identify the grounds on which he or she believes the subpoena is improper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc ID No. 6 - MMM)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re 10 Motion for Hearing re Subpoena. The Court construes the letter as a motion to quash the subpoena Plaintiff served on Internet Service Providers. The pending motion is DENIED without prejudice. Ms. Jones is instructed that she is free to file a new motion to quash the subpoena, but any such motion must identify the grounds on which she believes the subpoena is improper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc C. Jones - MMM)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OMNIBUS TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?