ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2017cv00126
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that 39 Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, consistent with the foregoing. FURTHER ORDERED that 35 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall prepare and file an appropriate judgment for the court's signature consistent with the foregoing within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that 23 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that all defendants except for Shannon Soisoongnoen be, and the same hereby are, dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that all Defendants except Defendant Shannon Soisoongnoen be SEVERED and DISMISSED without prejudice. To the extent any subpoenas remain outstanding in this case, they are hereby QUASHED. Plaintiff is ORDERE D to promptly serve a copy of this order on the recipients of any outstanding subpoenas, andshall file a proof of service of the same by June 20, 2017. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 13 Order to Show Cause.The Court hereby ORDERS the recipients of the subpoenas not to provide the subpoenaed information pending resolution of the order to show cause.Plaintiff is further ORDERED to immediately serve a copy of this order on the recipients of the subpoenas, and to file a proof of service so indicating by noon on May 12, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that 11 Motion to extend the deadline to amend the complaint is GRANTED in part and that deadline is EXTENDED to May 22, 2017. The alternative request to eliminate such deadline is DENIED. The motion to extend the deadline to effectuate service is GRANTED and that deadline is EXTENDED to June 26, 2017. The motion for a hearing (ECF No. 12 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The Court hereby WARNS Plaintiff and its counsel that they must strictly comply with the Court's orders. Failure to do so in the future may result in significant sanctions, up to and including dismissal. The Court otherwise DISCHARGES the order to show cause. In addition, Plaintiff has still not filed an amended complaint as ordered. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file, no later than 4/24/17, either an amended complaint or a proper request to extend the applicable deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that 3 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Take Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?