Hudson v. Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian J. Hudson
Defendant: Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc., Equifax, Inc, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00161
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 27 and 28 Stipulations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant AD ASTRA RECOVERY SERVICES, INC. shall participate in Arbitration proceedings to resolve controversies brought against Defendant Ad Astra by the P laintiff; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant AD ASTRA RECOVERY SERVICES, INC. is hereby dismissed with prejudice from the above-captioned action; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant AD ASTRA RECOVERY SERVICES, INC., be stricken from the caption in the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all motions by AD ASTRA 14 , 17 , and 18 are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that 25 the parties' Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Represented By: Raleigh C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles E Gianelloni
Represented By: Bob L. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J. Hudson
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?