Harris v. Nissan-Infiniti LT et al
Plaintiff: Becky Harris
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Nissan-Infiniti LT and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00191
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 41 plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Withdraw 39 First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 41 Motion for Leave to File Document. Responses due by 2/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting without prejudice Defendant SLS' 13 Motion to Dismiss. If Plaintiff wishes to request leave to file an Amended Complaint she must do so within 21 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that a hearing on the Stipulation for Extension of Time (ECF No. 33 ) is scheduled for 2:30 PM, November 1, 2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC's Emergency Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Complaint (ECF No. 20 ) will be briefed in the ordinary course pursuant to LR 7-2. FURTHER ORDERED that discovery is stayed pending further order of the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC's Emergency Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Complaint (ECF No. 20 ) is scheduled for 10:00 AM, May 26, 2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 15 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC answer due 3/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Nissan-Infiniti LT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan-Infiniti LT
Represented By: E. Daniel Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Represented By: Michael R Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Harris
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Sean N. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?