Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Eddie Haddad et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Eddie Haddad and Wexford Village Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00242
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 84 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 11:00 AM, 1/21/2020, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER that the settlement conference scheduled for November 13, 2019, is VACATED. Submission of Proposed Stipulation due by 1/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Stipulation; Re: 65 Motion for Summary Judgment, 62 Motion for Summary Judgment, Responses due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Stipulation; Re: 49 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Stipulation; Re: 40 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Stipulation; Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/13/2018. Motion to Dismiss due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part 31 Motion to Lift Stay of Case; Eddie Haddad answer due 11/2/2018; Wexford Village Homeowners Association answer due 11/2/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/2/2018. The parties have until 10/22/2018 to meet and confer. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Motion to Dismiss.; Case stayed. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Eddie Haddad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Shadd A. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Village Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?