Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Desert Greens Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00259
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 81 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. It is further ordered that all currently pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 79 MOTION to remove attorney Dana Jonathon Nitz, Esq. from the Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 75 Stipulation of Dismissal and Disclaimer of Interest as to HSBC Bank USA and Denying as moot 65 Motion for Default Judgment; the 73 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 65 Motion for Default Judgment against third party defendant HSBC be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 5/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Defendant's 8 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff must submit a bond pursuant to this Order in the amount of $500.00 as to Defendant. Failure to do so within thirty days of the filing date of this Order shall constitute grounds for dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Greens Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Michael S. Kelley
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?