Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC et al v. Decatur Mountain Villas Homeowners' Association et al
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Decatur Mountain Villas Homeowners' Association and G.J.L., Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2017cv00317
Filed: February 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Stipulation Confirming Validity of Deed of Trust; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Re: 25 Status Report. Parties shall have until January 10, 2018 to file their stipulation to dismiss with prejudice or, conversely, to file a joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion. The summons and complaint in this suit be served on defendant Pro Forma herein by publication thereof in the above-named newspaper and that the publication be made for a period of four (4) weeks and at least once per we ek. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the time for service of the summons and complaint upon defendant Pro Forma is extended for an additional sixty (60) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC et al v. Decatur Mountain Villas Homeowners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decatur Mountain Villas Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.J.L., Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?