JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Aliante Master Association, Aaron M. Nanez, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Nicole D. Verheyen
Case Number: 2:2017cv00329
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 76 Stipulation to Dismiss with prejudice. The $500 in security costs posted by Chase on 6/20/2017 pursuant to 271 Order shall be discharged and released to the Ballard Spahr LLP Trust Account. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - SLD)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Re: 74 Status Report, that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 70 Stipulation to Stay Entire Case Pending Settlement (First Request). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Denying without prejudice pending 46 , 47 , and 49 Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation re 17 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Chase is to deposit a check for $500.00 with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 11 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint. Aliante Master Association's Responses due by 6/9/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting in part Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Extend Deadline to Effectuate Service. The deadline to serve Defendants is extended by 60 days. Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Service by Publication is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliante Master Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron M. Nanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole D. Verheyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?