Wysocki v. Dourian
Plaintiff: Dale Wysocki
Defendant: Dikran Dourian
Case Number: 2:2017cv00333
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/12/2018. Motions due by 5/14/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 35 NOTICE re: Agreement of Attorney's Fees. IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff DALE WYSOCKI pay the sum of One-Thousand Eight-Hundred and Eighty-Eight Dollars ($1,888.00) to Defendant DIKRAN DOURIAN's counsel (i.e. Morris, Sullivan, Lemkul & Pitegoff, LLP) on or before 1/5/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation to Extend Time. Notice of Agreement for Attorney Fees due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The Court hereby SETS a hearing on 21 the second motion for sanctions for 11:00 a.m. on 11/13/17, in Courtroom 3C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The Court STRIKES the documents filed at Docket Nos. 11 , 12 and instructs the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket in the future absent a Court order that they do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wysocki v. Dourian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dikran Dourian
Represented By: Daniel S. Cereghino
Represented By: Christopher A Turtzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Wysocki
Represented By: Ronald A. Colquitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?