JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Casa Palermo 20N Homeowners' Association, Faranak Panahbarhagh and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00342
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Main Document 53 replaced on 9/25/2018) (JM).
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Stipulation; This case will not be stayed. All pending discovery deadlines are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, May 22, 2018, in Courtroom 3D. If a proposed stipulation and order for dismissal is filed before May 21, 2018, then the status hearing will be vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Stipulation; Discovery due by 4/16/2018. Motions due by 5/21/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Stipulation; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Amended Answer due 11/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Russell Jason Burke and Holly Priest terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa Palermo 20N Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faranak Panahbarhagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?