U.S. Bank, N.A. v. LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Defendant: LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group, LLC, Rainbow Villas Condominium Association and Terra West Collections Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00355
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting ECF No. 119 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Hong & Hong Law Office is substituted in as counsel for Defendant LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group, LLC, in the place and stead of The Law Office of Mike Beed, PLLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re ECF No. 111 Proposed Order - Plaintiff U.S. Bank's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 80 ) is granted in part to the extent of its request for declaratory relief that the HOA sale did not e xtinguish the deed of trust, which deed of trust was recorded with the Clark County Recorder as Instrument No. 20060615 - 0004185. Defendant LVRES's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 81 ) is denied. The remaining claims are dismissed as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting ECF No. 108 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Adam H. Springel and Michael A. Arata removed from case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting Springel and Fink LLP's ECF No. 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - Wendy Lynn Walker, Leonard T. Fink, and Adam H. Springel withdrawn from the case; directing Springel and Fink to serve a copy of this order on Defendan t Rainbow Villas Condominium Association and to file proof of that service by 1/24/2020; directing that on or before 2/7/2020, Defendant Rainbow Villas Condominium Association must retain a new attorney and that attorney must file a notice of appearance in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting ECF No. 99 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Rainbow Villas Condominium Association and Terra West Collections Group, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting ECF No. 97 Motion to Remove Attorney Jared M. Sechrist from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting ECF No. 69 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/26/2019. (Attorney Thera A Cooper terminated for U.S. Bank, N.A.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting ECF No. 66 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jason Sifers of McDonald Carano LLP in place of Aviva Y. Gordon for defendant Terra West Collection Group, LLC d/b/a Assessment Management Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting ECF No. 63 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting ECF No. 60 Stipulation re Substitution of Counsel : Attorneys Melanie Morgan and Thera A. Cooper, substituted in the place and stead of Dana Nitz, Natalie Lehman, and YanXiong Li, for plaintiff U.S. Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, N.A. v. LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Villas Condominium Association
Represented By: Michael A. Arata
Represented By: Adam H. Springel
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra West Collections Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Natalie C. Lehman
Represented By: YanXiong Li
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?