Garcia v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Karisma Garcia
Defendant: James Cox, James Dzurenda, NDOC Medical Dept, NDOC Medical Director, Nevada Dept of Corrections, Warden Dwight Neven, State of Nevada and Warden Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2017cv00359
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 52 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Motions due by 6/1/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 49 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Motions due by 4/1/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 45 UNOPPOSED MOTION - Voluntary Dismissal of Mar & Irvin. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/5/2020. Sylvia Irvin and David Mar terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 43 Stipulation for Extension of time re: Discovery. Discovery due by 1/8/2021. Motions due by 2/8/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall not be required to pay an initial installment of the filing fee. Service must be perfected within 90 days from the date of this order pu rsuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Within 21 days of the date of entry of this order the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and Plaintiff re names of Defendants for whom it does/does not accept service for. This case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to NDOC; electronically serve Attorney General this Order and 9 Amended Complaint - SLD)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Complaint deadline: 5/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDOC Medical Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDOC Medical Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karisma Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?